blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0981161


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.01.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  23.02.2000 [2000/08]
25.06.2001 Renewal fee
26.04.2002 Publication of search report published on  12.06.2002  [2002/24]
25.06.2002 Renewal fee
19.07.2002 Request for examination filed published on  04.09.2002  [2002/36]
25.10.2002 First examination report
25.10.2002 Examination report or reply
17.01.2003 Definitive list of designations published on  05.03.2003  [2003/10]
28.02.2003 Examination report or reply
14.05.2003 Change - extension states
28.06.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.02.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
22.06.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.06.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.06.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.01.2008 Change - German title published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
02.02.2008 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.06.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.06.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.07.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.07.2008 Change: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2008 (Expected) grant published on  13.08.2008  [2008/33]
19.09.2008 Change - representative published on  22.10.2008  [2008/43]
13.02.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2009  [2009/12]
19.06.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  22.07.2009  [2009/30]
08.01.2010 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.02.2010  [2010/06]