blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0971119


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
27.07.2001 Renewal fee
28.12.2001 Publication of search report published on  13.02.2002  [2002/07]
07.06.2002 Request for examination filed published on  24.07.2002  [2002/30]
26.07.2002 Renewal fee
13.09.2002 Definitive list of designations published on  30.10.2002  [2002/44]
14.01.2003 Change - extension states
31.07.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.08.2003 First examination report
03.01.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
17.03.2004 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.06.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.07.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.08.2004 (Expected) grant published on  22.09.2004  [2004/39]
29.07.2005 No opposition filed within time limit published on  14.09.2005  [2005/37]