blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993088


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
29.09.2000 Request for examination filed published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
09.11.2000 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
11.11.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.12.2000 [2000/52]
02.01.2001 Change - extension states
07.02.2001 Loss of particular rights
22.05.2001 Loss of particular rights
30.10.2001 Renewal fee
29.10.2002 Renewal fee
22.11.2002 Change - representative published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
30.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.10.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.10.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.03.2006 Change - representative published on  10.05.2006  [2006/19]
07.04.2006 Change - representative published on  24.05.2006  [2006/21]
01.09.2006 Change - applicant published on  04.10.2006  [2006/40]
07.11.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.06.2007 First examination report
23.10.2007 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.10.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.12.2007 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
09.04.2008 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
16.05.2008 (Expected) grant published on  18.06.2008  [2008/25]
06.06.2008 Change - representative published on  09.07.2008  [2008/28]
20.06.2008 Change - divisional application(s) published on  23.07.2008  [2008/30]
09.01.2009 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.02.2009  [2009/07]
24.04.2009 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.05.2009  [2009/22]