blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0969158


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
02.03.2001 Publication of search report published on  18.04.2001 [2001/16]
19.06.2001 Renewal fee
03.08.2001 Request for examination filed published on  19.09.2001 [2001/38]
03.08.2001 Change - extension states
08.08.2001 Request for accelerated examination
19.11.2001 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
23.11.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
08.02.2002 Loss of particular rights
26.02.2002 Examination report or reply
02.03.2002 First examination report
21.03.2002 Change - extension states
07.06.2002 Loss of particular rights
10.06.2002 Examination report or reply
19.06.2002 Renewal fee
13.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
05.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
28.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  13.08.2003  [2003/33]