Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1053522


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
31.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
04.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
26.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
28.07.2000 Renewal fee
28.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
06.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
03.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
06.07.2001 First examination report
18.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.09.2001 Communication of intention to grant
14.01.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.03.2002 Renewal fee
08.03.2002 (Expected) grant published on  24.04.2002  [2002/17]
28.02.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  16.04.2003  [2003/16]
01.08.2008 Change - applicant published on  03.09.2008  [2008/36]