blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0995045


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
01.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
06.03.2000 Amendment by applicant
10.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
02.06.2000 Change - applicant published on  19.07.2000 [2000/29]
03.05.2001 Renewal fee
26.04.2002 Renewal fee
06.08.2002 Examination report or reply
09.08.2002 First examination report
17.12.2002 Examination report or reply
25.04.2003 Renewal fee
03.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
29.05.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.09.2003 (Expected) grant published on  29.10.2003  [2003/44]
03.09.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  20.10.2004  [2004/43]