Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2063219 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 418
31.01.2000 Priority document Search / examination 28
31.01.2000 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
17.01.2009 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
17.01.2009 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
17.01.2009 Drawings Search / examination 4
17.01.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.01.2009 Description Search / examination 11
17.01.2009 Claims Search / examination 2
17.01.2009 Annex Search / examination 14
17.01.2009 Annex Search / examination 25
17.01.2009 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.01.2009 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
04.02.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
21.04.2009 European search report Search / examination 2
21.04.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 3
21.04.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2009 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
04.06.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
13.08.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 11
13.08.2009 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
13.08.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
07.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
05.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.04.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
01.06.2011 Description Search / examination 4
01.06.2011 Description Search / examination 12
01.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
01.06.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
03.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
03.06.2011 Description Search / examination 4
03.06.2011 Description Search / examination 12
03.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 2
03.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 8
24.04.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
24.04.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 2
24.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
25.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
27.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
11.06.2013 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
11.06.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
13.06.2013 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
03.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 39
05.09.2013 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 24
05.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
05.09.2013 Description Appeal 13
05.09.2013 Claims Appeal 1
05.09.2013 Claims Appeal 1
20.09.2013 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
30.09.2013 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
14.10.2013 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.04.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
20.04.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
07.02.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
15.02.2017 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
21.02.2017 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 22
21.02.2017 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
22.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.02.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.03.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
03.04.2017 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 2
04.04.2017 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
04.04.2017 F3014 Oral proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
10.04.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 23
20.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.04.2017 Description Appeal 11
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Claims Appeal 1
20.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Appeal 12
20.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
20.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
20.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.06.2017 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
28.06.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
07.07.2017 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.07.2017 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 13
10.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.07.2017 Refund of fees Appeal 1
17.07.2017 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
23.10.2017 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 2
23.10.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1