|
31.01.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.01.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.04.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.04.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2009 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
24 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Description |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2013 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.09.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
22 |
|
21.02.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.04.2017 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2017 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Description |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Appeal |
12 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.04.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.04.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.06.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.12.2017 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.03.2018 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |