EP1026302 - Device for winding a nonwoven mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll GmbH & Co. OHG Rockwool Strasse 37-41 45966 Gladbeck / DE | [2001/41] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Deutsche Rockwool Mineralwoll-GmbH Rockwool Strasse 37-41 45966 Gladbeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Gerd-Rüdiger, Dr. Lembecker Strasse 75 46286 Dorsten / DE | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel Stenger - Watzke - Ring intellectual property Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [2000/32] | Wanischeck-Bergmann, Axel, Dipl.-Ing. Rondorfer Strasse 5a 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100941.4 | 19.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE1999104121 | 03.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19904121 | DE1999123352 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: DE 19923352 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026302 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026302 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026302 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/70 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
D04H1/4209 (EP);
B65H18/22 (EP);
D01G27/00 (EP);
D04H1/4218 (EP);
D04H1/70 (EP);
B65H2701/1922 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/38] |
Former [2003/24] | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE | ||
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines Faservlieses | [2000/32] | English: | Device for winding a nonwoven mat | [2000/32] | French: | Dispositif pour enrouler une bande non-tissée | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 24.03.2004 | FR | 24.03.2004 | GB | 24.03.2004 | IE | 24.03.2004 | IT | 24.03.2004 | NL | 24.03.2004 | DK | 24.06.2004 | GR | 24.06.2004 | SE | 24.06.2004 | ES | 05.07.2004 | PT | 24.08.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/35] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
FR | 24.03.2004 | ||
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
IT | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
FR | 24.03.2004 | ||
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
NL | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
DK | 24.06.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
IE | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
ES | 05.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GB | 24.03.2004 | ||
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
GR | 24.06.2004 | ||
SE | 24.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 24.03.2004 | |
SE | 24.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3964232 (BENDER DAVID JOHN, et al) [AD] 1 * Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]DE2516226 (MUELLER FORST C KG) [A] 1,2,5 * Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]EP0131475 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 1,13-15* Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]WO8501278 (BALZER PETER) [A] 1,10 * Ansprüche 1,2,4,5,6;; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2685904 (SAINT GOBAIN ISOVER [FR]) [A] 1,2,11 * Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]FR2731687 (TICTOR SA [FR]) [A] 11 * Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]US5832696 (NAGY GABOR [US], et al) [A] 1,2,11 * Ganzes Dokument *; | [A]EP0949172 (TECHINT SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5 * Ganzes Dokument * |