05.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
01.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
26.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
10.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
22.06.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
08.06.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
25.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2007 [2007/26] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
27.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
06.04.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
16.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
14.07.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2006 [2006/33] |
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
30.03.2006 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.10.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
11.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2003 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.11.2003 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
30.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2003 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] |
21.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
20.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.12.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.01.2003 [2003/05] |
18.10.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
09.05.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
27.04.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.06.2001 [2001/24] |