Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4686843B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2011 | B2 | JP2002052698 | 19.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2000161458 | 31.05.2000 | JP34635699 | 06.12.1999 | JP2000335350 | 02.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1106361 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2006 | B1 | EP1106361 | 04.12.2002 | A3 | EP1106361 | 13.06.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2000161458 | 31.05.2000 | JP34635699 | 06.12.1999 | JP2000335350 | 02.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE336379T | 15.09.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000161458 | 31.05.2000 | JP34635699 | 06.12.1999 | JP2000335350 | 02.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60030072T | 22.02.2007 | T2 | DE60030072D1 | 28.09.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000161458 | 31.05.2000 | JP34635699 | 06.12.1999 | JP2000335350 | 02.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6561611 | 13.05.2003 | B2 | US2001012026 | 09.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2000161458 | 31.05.2000 | JP34635699 | 06.12.1999 | JP2000335350 | 02.11.2000 |