EP1106361 - Recording apparatus comprising a detector unit and ink cartridge in a recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/24] | Ink jet head cartridge with presence detector and detection method | ||
[2005/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/33] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Yoichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Kazuhisa c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 03 /
Yamashita, Norihiro c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 04 /
Ukita, Mamoru c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 05 /
Otsuka, Kazuo c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | 06 /
Kurashima, Norihiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano / JP | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00126436.5 | 06.12.2000 | [2001/24] | Priority number, date | JP19990346356 | 06.12.1999 Original published format: JP 34635699 | JP20000161458 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000161458 | JP20000335350 | 02.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000335350 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1106361 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1106361 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1106361 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J29/393 | [2002/26] | CPC: |
B41J2/17543 (EP,US);
B41J11/0095 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/24] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/24] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät mit einer Detektoreinheit und Tintenpatrone in einem Aufzeichnungsgerät | [2005/50] | English: | Recording apparatus comprising a detector unit and ink cartridge in a recording apparatus | [2005/50] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement muni d'une unité de detection et cartouche d'encre dans un appareil d'enregistrement | [2005/50] |
Former [2001/24] | Tintenstrahldruckkopfkassette mit Anwesenheitsdetektor und Detektionsverfahren | ||
Former [2001/24] | Ink jet head cartridge with presence detector and detection method | ||
Former [2001/24] | Cartouche pour tête d'impression à jet d'encre avec détecteur de présence et méthode de détection | Examination procedure | 04.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | BE | 16.08.2006 | CH | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | IT | 16.08.2006 | LI | 16.08.2006 | NL | 16.08.2006 | TR | 16.08.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | ES | 27.11.2006 | IE | 06.12.2006 | LU | 06.12.2006 | MC | 31.12.2006 | PT | 16.01.2007 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
TR | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
LU | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.12.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
MC | 31.12.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
NL | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
ES | 27.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
LI | 16.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04178638 ; | [A]US4709248 (PIATT MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 26* column 6, line 18 - line 53; figures 9A,9B *; | [A]EP0361753 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,4-6,9,22,23,27,29 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0540244 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]); | [XAY]EP0626267 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,22,27,28,14,17 * column 18, line 1 - line 22; figure 18 * * column 19, line 35 - column 20, line 13; figures 22,23A,23B * * column 20, line 30 - line 41; figures 24A,24B * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 4; figures 6,7 * * column 11, line 15 - line 28 * * column 19, line 16 - line 28; figure 18 * [A] 2,4-6,9,23 [Y] 11-13; | [XY]EP0689936 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,22,27,29 * page 7, line 4 - line 51; figures 10-15 * * page 5, line 23 - line 26; figures 1,12 * * page 6, line 44 - page 7, line 3; figure 8 * [Y] 11-13; | [A]EP0718104 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 11 * column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 2; figure 6 *; | [A]US5721581 (SAITO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 61 - line 64; figure 2 * * column 12, line 41 - line 67; figure 8 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921014), vol. 016, no. 495, Database accession no. (P - 1436), & JP04178638 A 19920625 (CANON INC) [A] 11-13 * abstract * |