EP1094680 - Base station selection in a cellular mobile communication network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mohebbi, Behzad Apartment 90, 12774 Torrey Bluff Drive San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00126473.8 | 28.04.1999 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | GB19980010424 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: GB 9810424 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1094680 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1094680 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
H04B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,KR,US);
H04W84/042 (KR);
H04W36/0064 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/17] | Title | German: | Basisstationsauswahl in einem zellularen mobilen Funkkommunikationsnetz | [2001/17] | English: | Base station selection in a cellular mobile communication network | [2001/17] | French: | Sélection de station de base dans un réseau de communication cellulaire mobile | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99919415.2 / EP1078547 | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 21.01.2004 | SE | 21.04.2004 | [2004/40] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0797367 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) |