EP1113179 - A restraint and tension-adjustment unit for an elongate element, particularly a flexible control cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SILA HOLDING INDUSTRIALE S.r.l. Via Arcivescovado, 5 10121 Torino / IT | [2001/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Melis, Salvatore Corso Francia 72 10093 Collegno (Torino) / IT | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Fioravanti, Corrado, et al Jacobacci & Perani S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00128506.3 | 27.12.2000 | [2001/27] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO01170 | 29.12.1999 Original published format: IT TO991170 | [2001/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113179 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/22 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
F16C1/223 (EP);
F16C1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/13] |
Former [2001/27] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung und Spannungsregelung für einen langgestreckten Körper, insbesondere einen Bowdenzug | [2001/27] | English: | A restraint and tension-adjustment unit for an elongate element, particularly a flexible control cable | [2001/27] | French: | Système de retenue et de réglage de tension pour un corps allongé, en particulier une commande flexible à cable | [2001/27] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/06] | 19.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/46] | 08.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2417671 (TELEFLEX INC [US]) [A] 1,10,11,16* the whole document *; | [A]US5163338 (SHARP HAROLD L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8,12 * column W *; | [X]US5394770 (BOIKE RANDY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,12 * column W *; | [X]US5570612 (REASONER MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,12 * column W *; | [A]US5598743 (YASUDA TETSURO [JP]) [A] 1,2,4,9,12 * column W *; | [X]US5673596 (LU JIAN GANG [US]) [X] 1-5,7-9,12 * column W *; | [A]US5850763 (KITAMURA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1,10,16 * column W *; | [A]DE19825359 (UNITED PARTS FHS AUTOMOBIL SYS [DE]) [A] 1-3,12-14 * the whole document * |