Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1020784

EP1020784 - A comfort controls system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.02.2005
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell Control Systems Ltd.
Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell
Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
Honeywell Control Systems Ltd.
Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park
Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Mackie, Alastair D.
4 Cullion Way, Newarthill
Motherwell, ML1 5SF / GB
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/29]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date00300235.914.01.2000
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateGB1999000074214.01.1999         Original published format: GB 9900742
GB1999000073914.01.1999         Original published format: GB 9900739
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1020784
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1020784
Date:30.05.2001
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:G05D23/19, F24D19/10
[2001/22]
Former International [2000/29]G05D23/19
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:Komfortsteuerungssystem[2000/29]
English:A comfort controls system[2000/29]
French:Dispositif de commande du confort[2000/29]
Examination procedure09.11.2001Examination requested  [2002/02]
05.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/14]
03.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
05.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
07.01.2005Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200203   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2002
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2152255  (ALEXANDER ELECTRONICS LTD) [X] 1,6-8,10,12 * page 1, line 36 - line 49 * * page 2, line 2 - page 3, line 15; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-4;
 [Y]GB2183068  (MICRO DESIGN ASSOCIATES LTD.) [Y] 2 * page 2, line 50 - line 60; figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]GB1520647  (INTERNATINAL HOME SYSTEMS) [Y] 3,4 * page 2, line 85 - line 92 * * page 3, line 15 - line 25; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]GB2094503  (A. FOWELL & C. DOUGLAS) [A] 1,8,10 * abstract *