EP1043659 - System and method for preventing computer programs to be altered and computer program storage medium therefor. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/41] | File signature check | ||
[2002/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | ||
For all designated states Konami Computer Entertainment Tokyo Co., Ltd. 3-25, Kanda Jimbocho, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | |||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Konami Corporation 4-1, Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6330 / JP | ||
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Hirotaka 102 Itou-haitsu, 2-19-4 Suidou Bunkyou-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Brunner, Michael John GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 00302896.6 | 05.04.2000 | [2000/41] | Priority number, date | JP19990103256 | 09.04.1999 Original published format: JP 10325699 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1043659 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1043659 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1043659 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/00, G06F1/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
G06F21/565 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/41] | G06F11/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Extension states | AL | 04.01.2002 | LT | 04.01.2002 | LV | 04.01.2002 | MK | 04.01.2002 | RO | 04.01.2002 | SI | 04.01.2002 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Vorbeugung von Computerprogrammänderungen und entsprechender Computerprogrammdatenträger. | [2002/41] | English: | System and method for preventing computer programs to be altered and computer program storage medium therefor. | [2002/41] | French: | Système et méthode pour la prévention d'altération de programmes d' ordinateurs et support de programme d'ordinateur associé | [2002/41] |
Former [2000/41] | Dateiunterschriftsprüfung | ||
Former [2000/41] | File signature check | ||
Former [2000/41] | Vérification d'une signature d'un fichier | Examination procedure | 04.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/11] | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | BE | 11.06.2003 | CH | 11.06.2003 | CY | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | IT | 11.06.2003 | LI | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | ES | 22.09.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
CY | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
BE | 11.06.2003 | ||
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
ES | 22.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 11.06.2003 | |
LI | 11.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5598530 (NAGAE TAKAAKI [JP]); | [A] - OHLSSON J ET AL, "IMPLICIT SIGNATURE CHECKING", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON FAULT TOLERANT COMPUTING,US,LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, (19950627), vol. SYMP. 25, ISBN 0-7803-2965-1, pages 218 - 227, XP000597794 [A] 1 * the whole document * |