Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2000293370 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2000 | A | JP3056732B | 26.06.2000 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP10325699 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1043659 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2003 | B1 | EP1043659 | 22.08.2001 | A3 | EP1043659 | 11.10.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP10325699 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE242894T | 15.06.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP10325699 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60003253T | 04.12.2003 | T2 | DE60003253D1 | 17.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP10325699 | 09.04.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6539266 | 25.03.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP10325699 | 09.04.1999 |