EP1103410 - Anchor assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Rodger, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd Stafford Park 6, Telford Shropshire, TF3 3RQ / GB | 02 /
Leon, Pacho, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd The Hamilton Centre, Rodney Way, Widford Chelmsford, Essex, CM1 3BY / GB | 03 /
Taylor, Alex, c/o Johnson Controls Automotive Ltd Stafford Park 6, Telford Shropshire, TF3 3RQ / GB | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310439.5 | 24.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | GB19990027855 | 26.11.1999 Original published format: GB 9927855 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103410 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103410 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | [2003/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/015, B60N2/07 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
B60N2/01516 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/22] | B60N2/015, B60N2/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/24] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Ankeranordnung | [2001/22] | English: | Anchor assembly | [2001/22] | French: | Ensemble d'ancrage | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/36] | 20.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB261460 (ARTHUR WILLIAM CHAPMAN) [X] 1,3 * page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 43; figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [X]JPH10181392 ; | [XY]FR2762815 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * page 6, line 14 - page 12, line 4; figures 2-6A * [Y] 5; | [XY]EP0949112 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 5, line 3 - column 10, line 28; figures 4-6 * [Y] 5; | [A]FR2771348 (FAURE BERTRAND EQUIPEMENTS SA [FR]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10181392 A 19980707 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1,6,10,11 * abstract * |