EP1103457 - Hooker cleat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Steiner, George 58 Hillcrest Avenue Lachine Quebec H8R 1J2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | For all designated states Steiner, George 58 Hillcrest Avenue Lachine, Quebec H8R 1J2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/22] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/22] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 00310567.3 | 29.11.2000 | [2001/22] | Priority number, date | US19990450896 | 29.11.1999 Original published format: US 450896 | [2001/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1103457 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1103457 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | [2003/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/04, B63B59/02, F16G11/14 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
B63B21/04 (EP,US);
B63B21/08 (EP,US);
F16G11/046 (EP,US);
F16G11/103 (EP,US);
F16G11/143 (EP,US);
Y10T24/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/40] |
Former [2001/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einhakbare Seilklemme | [2001/22] | English: | Hooker cleat | [2001/22] | French: | Serre-câble accrochable | [2001/22] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/01] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1546798 (NILS SEAGREN) [Y] 6 * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]FR644997 (JARRY JULES-LOUIS-ALBERT;ROUANET ROGER-LEGER-MARIE-FE) [Y] 2 * figure - *; | [Y]FR2388153 (SODERY SA [FR]) [Y] 2 * figure - *; | [XY]US4280435 (LOOMIS DONALD W) [X] 1,4,7,8 * column 2, line 57 - column 5, line 43; figure - * [Y] 2,6; | [A]US5493983 (HURT NORBERT M [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract * |