Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.11.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
15.08.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] |
15.07.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.01.2003 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
29.11.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
13.04.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] |