EP1110763 - Noise damper for a pneumatic tyre [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2006/12] |
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku# Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yukawa, Noaki, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nishikawa, Masami, Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Aoki, Chieko, c/o Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Sugihara, Hideaki, Sumitomo Rubber Industries Ltd 6-9, 3-chome Wakinohama-cho, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/26] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey Technical, Dunlop Tyres Ltd., Fort Dunlop Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00311597.9 | 21.12.2000 | [2001/26] | Priority number, date | JP19990365465 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36546599 | JP19990365467 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36546799 | JP19990365468 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36546899 | JP19990365469 | 22.12.1999 Original published format: JP 36546999 | JP19990374870 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37487099 | JP19990374872 | 28.12.1999 Original published format: JP 37487299 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1110763 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1110763 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1110763 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
B60B21/023 (EP,US);
B60B21/12 (EP,US);
B60C19/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/42] |
Former [2001/26] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schalldämpfer für Reifen | [2001/26] | English: | Noise damper for a pneumatic tyre | [2001/26] | French: | Amortisseur de bruit pour un bandage pneumatique | [2001/26] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 21.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04021749.9 / EP1484198 | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 21.12.2006 | [2007/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4755006 (CLAY SEAN S C [US], et al) [A] 2* figures 5-7 *; | [X]EP0737597 (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE INC [US]) [X] 1,15-17,19,20 * page 4, column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 30; figure - * * page 5, column 7, line 17 - line 33 * |