Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1067715
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
21.08.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] |
20.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.04.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.11.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
26.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.06.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
First examination report |
|
13.03.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] |
02.03.2007 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
21.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.06.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.06.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.12.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
10.08.2001 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.09.2001 [2001/39] |
20.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
24.11.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |