Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2001044937 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9908846 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1067715 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9908846 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2309777 | 08.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9908846 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2796230 | 05.10.2001 | B1 | FR2796230 | 12.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9908846 | 08.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6710904 | 23.03.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | FR9908846 | 08.07.1999 |