EP1152577 - CLOCK REPRODUCING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8501 / JP | [2007/17] |
Former [2001/45] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Shoji Room 301, 1-1, Arima 5-chome, Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 216-0003 / JP | 02 /
SHIRAISHI, Kenichi Room 407, 475-3, Kariba-cyo, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 240-0025 / JP | [2001/45] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/45] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00902120.5 | 07.02.2000 | [2001/45] | WO2000JP00654 | Priority number, date | JP19990033657 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3365799 | [2001/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0048371 | Date: | 17.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152577 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1152577 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.08.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/22, H04L7/033 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
H04L7/0334 (EP,US);
H04L27/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/45] | H04L27/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | SCHALTUNG ZUR TAKTRÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2001/45] | English: | CLOCK REPRODUCING CIRCUIT | [2001/45] | French: | CIRCUIT DE REPRODUCTION DE SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION | [2001/45] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2001 | Translation filed | 19.07.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 19.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 14.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JPH06252967 [ ]; | [A]EP0613268 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 23 * * column 6, line 42 - line 47 * * figures 6,7 * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941208), vol. 018, no. 646, Database accession no. (E - 1641), & JP06252967 A 19940909 (NEC CORP) [ ] * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH06252967 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH08331191 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |