EP1178983 - INDOLE-TYPE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF P38 KINASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIOS INC. 820 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2007/43] |
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states Scios Inc. 820 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAVUNKEL, Babu, J. 1348 Avoset Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Sarvajit 976-2 Alpine Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 03 /
PERUMATTAM, John, J. 30 Chester Circle Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | 04 /
DUGAR, Sundeep 5943 Sterling Oaks Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 05 /
LU, Qing 350 Foresail Court Foster City, CA 94404 / US | 06 /
LIANG, Xi 2905 Bainbridge Drive Apt.Co. Durham, NC 27713 / US | [2002/23] |
Former [2002/07] | 01 /
MAVUNKEL, Babu, J. 1348 Avoset Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | ||
02 /
CHAKRAVARTY, Sarvajit 976-2 Alpine Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | |||
03 /
PERUMATTAM, John, J. 30 Chester Circle Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | |||
04 /
DUGAR, Sundeep 5943 Sterling Oaks Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
05 /
LU, Qing 350 Foresail Court Foster City, CA 94404 / US | |||
06 /
LIANG, Xi 1011 Rosa Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building, Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 00939322.4 | 19.05.2000 | [2002/07] | WO2000US14003 | Priority number, date | US19990316761 | 21.05.1999 Original published format: US 316761 | US19990154594P | 17.09.1999 Original published format: US 154594 P | US20000202608P | 09.05.2000 Original published format: US 202608 P | [2002/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0071535 | Date: | 30.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1178983 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178983 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, A61K31/404, A61P43/00, C07D209/24, C07D401/14 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/07] | Extension states | AL | 21.11.2001 | LT | 21.11.2001 | LV | 21.11.2001 | MK | 21.11.2001 | RO | 21.11.2001 | SI | 21.11.2001 | Title | German: | DERIVATE DES INDOL-TYPS ALS P38 KINASE INHIBITOREN | [2002/07] | English: | INDOLE-TYPE DERIVATIVES AS INHIBITORS OF P38 KINASE | [2002/07] | French: | DERIVES DE TYPE INDOLE EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE p38 KINASE | [2002/07] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/07] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.10.2007 | BE | 24.10.2007 | CH | 24.10.2007 | CY | 24.10.2007 | DK | 24.10.2007 | FI | 24.10.2007 | LI | 24.10.2007 | NL | 24.10.2007 | SE | 24.01.2008 | DE | 25.01.2008 | GR | 25.01.2008 | ES | 04.02.2008 | PT | 24.03.2008 | GB | 19.05.2008 | IE | 19.05.2008 | LU | 19.05.2008 | IT | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/32] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
GB | 19.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
LU | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
CY | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
GB | 19.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
GB | 19.05.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
IE | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
FI | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
GR | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
DE | 25.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
BE | 24.10.2007 | ||
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
DK | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 24.10.2007 | |
CH | 24.10.2007 | ||
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | ||
PT | 24.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 24.10.2007 | |
LI | 24.10.2007 | ||
NL | 24.10.2007 | ||
SE | 24.01.2008 | ||
ES | 04.02.2008 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9806715 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [DA] 1,39 * claim - *; | [A]WO9828292 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,39 * claim - *; | [A]WO9900357 (VERTEX PHARMA [US]) [A] 1,39* page 3 - page 4 * |