EP1108313 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RANDOM ACCESS OF A RADIO CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOULSLEY, Timothy, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Damen, Daniel Martijn, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2001/25] | Scott, Kevin James Philips Corporate Intellectual Property Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 00945755.7 | 15.06.2000 | [2001/25] | WO2000EP05506 | Priority number, date | GB19990014926 | 26.06.1999 Original published format: GB 9914926 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0101641 | Date: | 04.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1108313 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
H04W74/0841 (EP,US);
H04W74/08 (KR);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04L1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM WAHLFREIEN ZUGRIFF EINES FUNKKANALS | [2001/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR RANDOM ACCESS OF A RADIO CHANNEL | [2001/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'ACCES ALEATOIRE A UN CANAL RADIO | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 01.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5892769 (LEE WHAY CHIOU [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10,12,13 * column 3, line 48 - line 51 * * column 5, line 11 - line 15 * * column 5, line 57 - line 65 * * column 13, line 23 - column 14, line 40; table 6 *; | [A]EP0551223 (CGA HBS [FR]) [A] 1,2,8,10 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 31 *; | [A]US4774707 (RAYCHAUDHURI DIPANKAR [US]) |