EP1200718 - SUCTION PIPE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mann + Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2003/51] |
Former [2002/18] | For all designated states FILTERWERK MANN & HUMMEL GmbH 71631 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIETROWSKI, Herbert in den Schafgärten 78 74385 Pleidelsheim / DE | 02 /
JESSBERGER, Thomas Henri-Arnaud-Strasse 43 D-71277 Rutesheim / DE | 03 /
KOCH, Ingo Strassenäcker 64 D-71634 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
NEUSCHWANDER, Helmut Rettistrasse 4 D-71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 05 /
MANDEL, Eckehard Baltenstrasse 31 D-71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2002/18] | Representative(s) | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Voth, Gerhard Mann+Hummel GmbH Hindenburgstrasse 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | ||
Former [2002/18] | Voth, Gerhard Filterwerk Mann + Hummel GmbH, Hindenburgstr. 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00945945.4 | 21.07.2000 | [2002/18] | WO2000EP07011 | Priority number, date | DE1999136470 | 03.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19936470 | [2002/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0109493 | Date: | 08.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1200718 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1200718 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F02B27/00 | [2002/18] | CPC: |
F02B27/0215 (EP,US);
F02B27/0263 (EP,US);
F02B27/0273 (EP,US);
F02D9/1095 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/18] | Title | German: | SAUGROHRANLAGE | [2002/18] | English: | SUCTION PIPE UNIT | [2002/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE COLLECTEUR D'ADMISSION | [2002/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/18] | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.03.2006 | FI | 15.03.2006 | IE | 15.03.2006 | NL | 15.03.2006 | DK | 15.06.2006 | SE | 15.06.2006 | GR | 16.06.2006 | ES | 26.06.2006 | AT | 21.07.2006 | LU | 21.07.2006 | CH | 31.07.2006 | LI | 31.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 16.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
AT | 21.07.2006 | ||
LU | 21.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
GR | 16.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
AT | 21.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
AT | 21.07.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
IT | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
CH | 31.07.2006 | ||
LI | 31.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
IE | 15.03.2006 | ||
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
PT | 16.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
DK | 15.06.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
ES | 26.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 15.03.2006 | |
NL | 15.03.2006 | ||
SE | 15.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9404803 (AUDI AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 [A] 3-16; | [A]WO9516112 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-16; | [A]WO9602743 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al)[A] 1-16 | Examination | DE19603758 | DE19651642 | WO0065214 |