Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6284100 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI0000649 | 14.07.2000 | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1197033 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP1197033 | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI0000649 | 14.07.2000 | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60026531T | 12.10.2006 | T2 | DE60026531D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FI0000649 | 14.07.2000 | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7107616 | 12.09.2006 | B2 | US2002095575 | 18.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI0000649 | 14.07.2000 | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0106700 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE320123T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1168260C | 22.09.2004 | C | CN1361959 | 31.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI115259B | 31.03.2005 | B | FI991617 | 17.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | FI991617 | 16.07.1999 |