EP1197033 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A RESPONSE FOR USE IN AN AUTHENTICATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/16] | METHOD OF PRODUCING A RESPONSE | ||
[2005/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Setec Oy Suometsäntie 1 01740 Vantaa / FI | [2006/10] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states Setec oy Suometsäntie 1 01740 Vantaa / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAATERO, Lauri Rikalantie 4 FIN-00970 Helsinki / FI | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2002/16] | Holmström, Stefan Mikael Kolster Oy Ab, Iso Roobertinkatu 23, P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 00949509.4 | 14.07.2000 | [2002/16] | WO2000FI00649 | Priority number, date | FI19990001617 | 16.07.1999 Original published format: FI 991617 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0106700 | Date: | 25.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197033 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197033 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/30 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
G06Q20/367 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3674 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3829 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ANTWORT ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2005/38] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A RESPONSE FOR USE IN AN AUTHENTICATION PROCESS | [2005/38] | French: | PROCEDE POUR OBTENIR UNE REPONSE APTE A ETRE UTILISE DANS UN PROCEDE D'AUTHENTICATION | [2005/38] |
Former [2002/16] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER ANTWORT | ||
Former [2002/16] | METHOD OF PRODUCING A RESPONSE | ||
Former [2002/16] | PROCEDE POUR OBTENIR UNE REPONSE | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/16] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.03.2006 | BE | 08.03.2006 | CH | 08.03.2006 | CY | 08.03.2006 | FI | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | LI | 08.03.2006 | NL | 08.03.2006 | DK | 08.06.2006 | SE | 08.06.2006 | GR | 09.06.2006 | ES | 19.06.2006 | IE | 14.07.2006 | LU | 14.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | PT | 08.08.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.07.2006 | ||
LU | 14.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
GR | 09.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
BE | 08.03.2006 | ||
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
PT | 08.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
DK | 08.06.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
ES | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
NL | 08.03.2006 | ||
SE | 08.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 08.03.2006 | |
CH | 08.03.2006 | ||
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 08.03.2006 | |
FI | 08.03.2006 | ||
LI | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 08.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4799258 (DAVIES DONALD W [GB]); | [A]US5546463 (CAPUTO ANTHONY A [US], et al); | [X]WO9935782 (CRYPTOGRAPHY RES INC [US]); | [X] - MESSERGES T. ET AL., "Investigation of power analysis attacks on smart cards", PROCEEDINGS OF THE USENIX WORKSHOP ON SMARTCARD TECHNOLOGY (SMARTCARD'99), USENIX ASSOC, USA, (19990510), pages 151 - 161, XP002905430 |