14.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
19.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
30.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
15.04.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
15.04.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] |
18.02.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
28.01.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
24.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
23.04.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.06.2004 [2004/24] |
16.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.04.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.11.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.06.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
28.06.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.08.2002 [2002/33] |
23.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.03.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|