EP1230053 - METHOD OF PRODUCING AN ARMATURE SEGMENT OF AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HÖGANÄS AB 263 83 Höganäs / SE | [2002/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jack, Alan, G., Milestone House Allendale Road Hexham, Northumberland NE46 2NB / GB | [2002/33] | Representative(s) | Thylén, Eva Matilda Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/33] | Thylén, Eva Matilda AWAPATENT AB, Berga Allé 1 254 52 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 00952096.6 | 28.07.2000 | [2002/33] | WO2000SE01521 | Priority number, date | SE19990002809 | 29.07.1999 Original published format: SE 9902809 | [2002/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112365 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1230053 | Date: | 14.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1230053 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/00, B22F5/00, H02K15/00 | [2002/33] | CPC: |
B22F7/08 (EP,US);
H02K15/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/33] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN PLATTENTEIL EINER ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2002/33] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING AN ARMATURE SEGMENT OF AN ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2002/33] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN INDUIT D'UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE | [2002/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2002 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 22.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/33] | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.06.2004 | BE | 09.06.2004 | CH | 09.06.2004 | CY | 09.06.2004 | FI | 09.06.2004 | LI | 09.06.2004 | NL | 09.06.2004 | IE | 28.07.2004 | LU | 28.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | DK | 09.09.2004 | GR | 09.09.2004 | SE | 09.09.2004 | PT | 09.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
CY | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
LU | 28.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
NL | 09.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
IE | 28.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
DK | 09.09.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
BE | 09.06.2004 | ||
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 09.06.2004 | |
CH | 09.06.2004 | ||
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
GR | 09.09.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
FI | 09.06.2004 | ||
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | ||
SE | 09.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 09.06.2004 | |
LI | 09.06.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1457504 (LOWEN F D); | [A]US4150927 (STEINGROEVER ERICH A [DE]); | [A]US5221503 (WARD ROBERT W [US], et al); | [A]US5722032 (GAY DAVID EARL [US]) |