|
03.11.2005 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.08.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (grant procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
132 |
|
28.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.03.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.01.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.01.2002 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.01.2002 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.01.2002 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.11.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.11.2001 |
Corrected international publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
11.05.2001 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.05.2001 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
130 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
16 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
113 |
|
08.12.2000 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
6 |