Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1226136
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
04.11.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
12.11.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] |
18.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.10.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.05.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] |
10.03.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2003 |
New entry: Examination report or reply |
|
20.05.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.09.2002 |
First examination report |
|
14.06.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
14.06.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.07.2002 [2002/31] |
04.06.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.06.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
30.04.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.12.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|