EP1226136 - TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRINGTON, Kenneth, L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
BILODEAU, Mark, T. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
FRALEY, Mark, E. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
HARTMAN, George, D. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
HOFFMAN, William, F. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
HUNGATE, Randall, W. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
KIM, Yuntae 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2002/31] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2002/31] | Thompson, John Dr. Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00978230.1 | 16.10.2000 | [2002/31] | WO2000US28625 | Priority number, date | US19990160356P | 19.10.1999 Original published format: US 160356 P | [2002/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0129025 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1226136 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226136 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/00 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/31] | Extension states | AL | 21.05.2002 | LT | 21.05.2002 | LV | 21.05.2002 | MK | 21.05.2002 | RO | 21.05.2002 | SI | 21.05.2002 | Title | German: | TYROSIN KINASEINHIBITOREN | [2002/31] | English: | TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITORS | [2002/31] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE TYROSINE KINASES | [2002/31] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/31] | 01.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9220642 (RHONE POULENC RORER INT [US]) [A] 1,8* page 42 *; | [A]WO9706144 (DU PONT MERCK PHARMA [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * pages 57-72; table 3 *; | [X] - MARTIN P. MAGUIRE, KIMBERLY R SHEETS, KAREN MCVETY AT AL., "A new series of PDGF receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitors: 3-substituted quinoline derivatives", J.MED.CHEM., (1994), vol. 37, pages 2129 - 2137, XP002164235 [X] 1-8,20,21,23-25 * page 2130, column R - page 2133, column L; example 2G * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00045a004 | [A] - LAURENT F.HENNEQUIN,ANDREW P.THOMAS, CRAIG JOHNSTONE, ET AL., "Design and structure-activity relationship of a new class of potent VEGF receptor tyrosine kinase inhibitors", J.MED.CHEM., (1999), vol. 42, pages 535369 - 5389, XP002164236 [A] 1,8 * page 5371, column R - page 5378, column L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm990345w |