EP1252047 - STEERING WHEEL WITH AIRBAG MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights, MI 48314 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights Michigan 48314 / US | ||
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states KEY SAFETY SYSTEMS, INC. 7000 Nineteen Mile Road Sterling Heights Michigan 48314 / US | ||
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Breed Automotive Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 33050 Lakeland, FL 33807-3050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORD, Brian 15 Breitmeyer Place Mt. Clemens, MI 48043 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Gislon, Gabriele Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00978394.5 | 06.11.2000 | [2002/44] | WO2000US30549 | Priority number, date | US20000498158 | 04.02.2000 Original published format: US 498158 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0156841 | Date: | 09.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1252047 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1252047 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
B60R21/2035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/22] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | LENKRAD MIT AIRBAGMODUL | [2002/44] | English: | STEERING WHEEL WITH AIRBAG MODULE | [2002/44] | French: | VOLANT DE DIRECTION POURVU D'UN MODULE AIRBAG | [2002/44] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2002 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/44] | 22.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 11.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5380037 (WORRELL BARRY C [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure - * * abstract ** column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 49 *; | [XA]EP0741063 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure -; claim - * [A] 3-6; | [A]EP0754602 (TEXTRON INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-8 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 37 *; | [A]EP0771696 (MST AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 3,4 * * abstract * * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A] - "SNAP-IN INFLATABLE RESTRAINT MODULE MOUNTING SYSTEM FOR STEERING WHEELS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE,GB,INDUSTRIAL OPPORTUNITIES LTD. HAVANT, (19971101), no. 403, ISSN 0374-4353, page 825, XP000726737 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * |