EP1212003 - DENTAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Dundee Nethergate, Perth Road Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states University of Dundee Nethergate, Perth Road Dundee DD1 4HN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHADWICK, Richard Graham 5 Bucklers Wynd Kellas, Dundee DD5 3TP / GB | 02 /
GIBSON, Charles, Proctor 13 Strips of Craigie Road Dundee DD4 1QA / GB | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 00985470.4 | 07.12.2000 | [2002/24] | WO2000GB04666 | Priority number, date | GB19990029007 | 09.12.1999 Original published format: GB 9929007 | [2002/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0141668 | Date: | 14.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212003 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/02, A61C3/00, A61B1/247 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
A61B1/247 (EP,US);
A61C3/00 (EP,US);
A61C5/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/24] | Title | German: | ZAHNÄRTZLICHES INSTRUMENT | [2002/24] | English: | DENTAL INSTRUMENT | [2002/24] | French: | INSTRUMENT DENTAIRE | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 01.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/01] | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.02.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | 06.02.2002 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.02.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   06.03.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CH488449 (MAILLEFER AUGUSTE SA [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]FR2570592 (VER DENTALWERKE ANTAEOS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4252522 |