|
23.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
99 |
|
29.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
26.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.01.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2004 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2003 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2003 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.2003 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2003 |
Partial European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2003 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.02.2003 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.12.2002 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
19.08.2002 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2002 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2002 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2002 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2002 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2002 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
07.11.2001 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2001 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.06.2001 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2001 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
105 |