20.09.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.12.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
03.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.04.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.12.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.10.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.10.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.08.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
24.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.01.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.01.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
20.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.10.2003 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
26.02.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
27.12.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] |
20.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.08.2002 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
02.08.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
22.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.07.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.11.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|