Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2288601 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0034998 | 26.12.2000 | US17162299 | 23.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1240350 | Global Dossier | 19.11.2003 | A4 | EP1240350 | 18.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0034998 | 26.12.2000 | US17162299 | 23.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2395416 | 28.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0034998 | 26.12.2000 | US17162299 | 23.12.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6762029 | 13.07.2004 | B2 | US2003170777 | 11.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74584200 | 26.12.2000 | US17162299 | 23.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0146454 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17162299 | 23.12.1999 |