EP1240350 - P2Y12 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 270 East Grand Avenue Suite 22 South San Francisco California 94080 / US | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states Portola Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 270 East Grand Avenue Suite 22 South San Francisco California 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | |||
Former [2003/06] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | |||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states COR THERAPEUTICS, INC. 256 East Grand Avenue, Suite 80 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | ||
For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONLEY, Pamela, B. 116 Lois Lane Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 02 /
JANTZEN, Hans-Michael 350 Church Street, H San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | 03 /
RAMAKRISHNAN-DUBRIDGE, Vanitha 825 Holly Road Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 04 /
JULIUS, David, Jay 50 Clifford Terrace San Francisco, CA 94117 / US | 05 /
HOLLOPETER, Gunther 2278 15th Street 2 San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Potts, Kerr & Co. 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2002/38] | Thomson, Paul Anthony Potts, Kerr & Co., 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead, Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 00986695.5 | 26.12.2000 | [2002/38] | WO2000US34998 | Priority number, date | US19990171622P | 23.12.1999 Original published format: US 171622 P | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0146454 | Date: | 28.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1240350 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.06.2001 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C07K16/28, G01N33/74, G01N33/50 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | C12P21/06, G01N33/53, C12N5/06, C12N5/16, C07K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | P2Y12 REZEPTOR | [2002/38] | English: | P2Y12 RECEPTOR | [2002/38] | French: | RECEPTEUR P2Y12 | [2002/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2002 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2002 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 28.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/43] | 05.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0034333 (ASTRA PHARMA INC [CA], et al) [PX] 1-17,33-38,46-48 * 99,364% identity of Fig.1 in 1258 nt overlap (total 1289) with SEQ ID NO. 1; 99,408% identity of Fig. 2 in 338aa overlap (total 343 aa) with SEQ ID NO: 2 *; | [PX]WO0028028 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-17,33-38,46-48 * 78,242% identity of SEQ ID NO: 2 in 1126 nt overlap (total 1289) with SEQ ID NO. 1; 87,24% identity of SEQ ID NO: 3 in 337aa overlap (total 343 aa) with SEQ ID NO: 2 * | International search | [X]WO9850549 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [Y] - BOYER ET AL., "Identification of competitive antoganists of the P2Y1 receptor", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (199611), vol. 50, pages 1323 - 1329, XP002938300 | [Y] - FABRE ET AL., "Decreased platelet aggregation, increased bleeding time and resistance to thromboembolism in P2Y1-deficient mice", NATURE MEDICINE, (199910), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 1199 - 1202, XP002940401 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/13522 | [ET] - HOLLOPETER ET AL., "Identification of the platelet ADP receptor targeted by antithrombotic drugs", NATURE, (200101), vol. 409, pages 202 - 207, XP002940402 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35051599 | by applicant | WO0003433 | WO0028028 | WO9850549 | US4736866 | US5602307 | US5728915 | US5731490 | US5723719 | US5731489 | US5720936 | US5489743 | - MILLS, D.C.B., THROMB. HEMOST., (1996), vol. 76, pages 835 - 56 | - KING, B.F.; TOWNSEND-NICHOLSON, A.; BURNSTOCK, G., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1998), vol. 19, pages 506 - 514 | - CATTANEO M.; GACHET C., ARTERIOSCLER. THROMB. VASC. BIOL., (1999), vol. 19, pages 2281 - 2285 | - KUNAPULI, S.P., TIPS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 391 - 394 | - KUNAPULI S.P. ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1998), vol. 336, pages 513 - 523 | - JANTZEN, H.M. ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (1999), vol. 81, pages 111 - 117 | - BOYER ET AL., "Identification of competitive antagonists of the P2Y1 receptor", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (199611), vol. 50, pages 1323 - 1329 | - FABRE ET AL., "Decreased platelet aggregation, increased bleeding time and resistance to thromboembolism in P2Y1-deficient mice", NATURE MEDICIN, (199910), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 1199 - 1202 | - MATTEUCCI ET AL., JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1981), vol. 103, pages 3185 - 3191 | - LTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ZHANG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1998), vol. 26, pages 3986 - 3990 | - KELLY ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2000), vol. 299, no. 2, pages 499 - 520 | - SHI ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1999), vol. 262, no. 1, pages 132 - 8 | - MATSUNAMI, NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, no. 6778, pages 601 - 4 | - SOUTHERN ET AL., JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND APPLIED GENETICS, (1982), vol. 1, no. 4, pages 327 - 34 | - COHEN ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, (1972), vol. 69, no. 8, pages 2110 - 2114 | - GRAHAM ET AL., VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 456 - 467 | - WIGLER ET AL., PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 1373 - 1376 | - SOUTHERN, JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1975), vol. 98, no. 3, pages 503 - 517 | - BERENT ET AL., BIOTECHNIC AND HISTOCHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 3, page 208 | - TAKAYAMA ET AL., METHODS IN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 69, pages 171 - 184 | - MA ET AL., METHODS, (1996), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 273 - 238 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (197508), vol. 256, no. 5517, pages 495 - 497 | - JANTZEN ET AL., THROMB. HAEMOST., (1999), vol. 81, pages 111 - 117 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 4939 - 4943 | - JULIUS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 558 - 563 | - Molecular Biology and Biotechnology, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 659 - 664 | - MULLINS ET AL., HYPERTENSION, (1993), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 630 - 633 | - BRENIN ET AL., SURGICAL ONCOLOGY, (1997), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 99 - 110 | - CLUTTER ET AL., GENETICS, (1996), vol. 143, no. 4, pages 1753 - 1760 | - MCCARTHY, THE LANCET, (1997), vol. 349, no. 9049, page 405 | - KIM ET AL., MOLECULAR REPRODUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT, (1997), vol. 46, no. 4, pages 515 - 526 | - HOUDEBINE, REPRODUCTION, NUTRITION, DEVELOPMENT, (1995), vol. 35, no. 6, pages 609 - 617 | - PETTERS, REPRODUCTION, FERTILITY AND DEVELOPMENT, (1994), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 643 - 645 | - SCHNIEKE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, no. 5346, pages 2130 - 2133 | - AMOAH, JOURNAL OFANIMAL SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 75, no. 2, pages 578 - 585 | - SEMENOV ET AL., BIULL EKSP BIOL MED, (1987), vol. 104, no. 7, pages 113 - 6 |