12.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
15.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
25.07.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
04.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
27.07.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
23.02.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
26.01.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] |
12.01.2007 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
10.11.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] |
13.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
06.10.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2006 [2006/45] |
22.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] |
15.09.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
20.01.2006 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
14.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2005 |
Change - German title |
published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] |
21.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.09.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.05.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
17.01.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
17.01.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.03.2003 [2003/10] |
15.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.10.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.09.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|