Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20020072563 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003519169 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4525801 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1286658 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP1286658 | 05.03.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0016884 | 01.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2395803 | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ20022220 | 15.01.2003 | A3 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60026618T | 18.01.2007 | T2 | DE60026618D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1052876 | 16.06.2006 | B | HK1052876 | 03.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA02006518 | 30.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20023135L | 23.08.2002 | L | NO20023135D0 | 27.06.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ519773 | 25.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL356817 | 12.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | US0042831 | 22.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001043906 | 22.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74738300 | 22.12.2000 | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0149260 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2002 | A3 | WO0149260 | 12.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE319424T | 15.03.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1230197C | 07.12.2005 | C | CN1434701 | 06.08.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200205167 | 05.11.2003 | B | Priority number | Date | US17392699 | 30.12.1999 |