EP1233478 - Cable assembly having strain relief mechanism and housing incorporating such cable assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES GmbH Hermann-Oberth-Strasse 22 85640 Putzbrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebender, Roland Rentbergstrasse 15 91710 Gunzenhausen / DE | [2002/34] | Representative(s) | Weber, Doris W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Postfach 11 47 85636 Putzbrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Weber, Doris W.L. Gore & Associates GmbH Postfach 11 47 85636 Putzbrunn / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01103403.0 | 14.02.2001 | [2002/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1233478 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1233478 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/58 | [2002/34] | CPC: |
H01R13/5804 (EP,US);
H01R9/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/20] |
Former [2002/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kabelanordnung mit Zugentlastung und Gehäuse welches diese Kabelanordnung beinhaltet | [2002/34] | English: | Cable assembly having strain relief mechanism and housing incorporating such cable assembly | [2002/34] | French: | Assemblage de câble avec décharge de traction et boîtier incorporant un tel assemblage | [2002/34] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 23.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5394592 (QUICK TODD N [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 30; figures 1,4 * [Y] 4,5,7,13,14,16; | [Y]DE29808030U (SCHREY GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 4,5,7,13,14,16* column W * |