Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
12.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] |
23.12.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
23.12.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
14.11.2003 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.09.2003 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.08.2003 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
28.08.2003 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
22.08.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] |
06.12.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 22.01.2003 [2003/04] |
11.01.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.02.2002 [2002/09] |