EP1182392 - Tapping device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georg Fischer Wavin AG Industriestrasse 24 4553 Subingen / CH | [2002/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frick, Ulrich Sulzstrasse 1 B 78224 Singen / DE | [2002/09] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang Georg Fischer AG Patentabteilung Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [2002/09] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o Georg Fischer AG, Amsler-Laffon-Strasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 01117054.5 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/09] | Priority number, date | DE2000141840 | 25.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10041840 | [2002/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1182392 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1182392 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/06 | [2002/09] | CPC: |
F16L41/06 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6123 (EP,US);
Y10T408/561 (EP,US);
Y10T408/5619 (EP,US);
Y10T408/56275 (EP,US);
Y10T408/6793 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/41] |
Former [2002/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Anbohrgerät | [2002/09] | English: | Tapping device | [2002/09] | French: | Appareil de perçage | [2002/09] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 18.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3820762 (MANIBS SPEZIALARMATUREN [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * figure - * [A] 6,10; | [XAY]DE1804122U (BRUEDER MANNESMANN INDUSTRIEBE [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,9 * figure - * [A] 6,8,10 [Y] 3,4; | [XA]DE1552243 (DRITTENPREIS HERBERT) [X] 1,7,9 * figure 1 * [A] 2-6,8,10; | [YA]FR2553687 (PIEDFORT ANC ETS MAURICE [FR]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 3,4 * [A] 1,2,5-10 | by applicant | DE3838435 |