EP1186715 - Snowplough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schmidt Holding GmbH Kurze Strasse 40 70794 Filderstadt-Bonlanden / DE | [2006/46] |
Former [2002/11] | For all designated states Schmidt Holding GmbH Kurze Strasse 40 70794 Filderstadt-Bonlanden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meissner, Uwe Riggenbacherweg 6 79872 Bernau / DE | 02 /
Engesser, Georg Dr. Schuhwerk-Strasse 22 79837 St. Blasien / DE | [2002/11] | Representative(s) | Möhring, Friedrich Grättinger - Möhring - von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/11] | Möhring, Friedrich Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121248.7 | 05.09.2001 | [2002/11] | Priority number, date | DE20001044560 | 08.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044560 | [2002/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1186715 | Date: | 13.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1186715 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1186715 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/06 | [2002/11] | CPC: |
E01H5/063 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [2004/29] |
Former [2002/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schneepflug | [2002/11] | English: | Snowplough | [2002/11] | French: | Chasse neige | [2002/11] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 23.04.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.11.2006 | [2019/34] |
Former [2009/32] | FR | 15.11.2006 | |
Former [2008/52] | FR | 15.11.2006 | |
IT | 15.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/23] | IT | 15.11.2006 | |
FR | 29.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | IT | 15.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3151726 (BEILHACK MASCHF MARTIN [DE]) [AD] 1* figures 1-4; claim 1 * | by applicant | DE3311019 | DE3151726 | DE3603496 |