EP1279452 - Tensionable clamping fastening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WENDT GmbH Fritz-Wendt-Strasse 1 D-40670 Meerbusch / DE | [2003/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voigt, Klaus Kremenhollerstrasse 60 42857 Remscheid / DE | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | DR. STARK & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE Moerser Strasse 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 01121889.8 | 12.09.2001 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | EP20010118012 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: EP 01118012 | [2003/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1279452 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279452 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/117, F16D1/06 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B24B9/00 (EP);
B23B31/11 (EP);
B24B45/00 (EP);
B24D5/02 (EP);
B27B5/32 (EP);
F16D1/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI [2003/42] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Spannbare Klemmbefestigung | [2003/05] | English: | Tensionable clamping fastening | [2003/05] | French: | Attache de fixation par serrage tensionable | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 09.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 30.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 22.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19961451 (HAIMER FRANZ [DE]) [A] 1 * column 8, line 44 - column 9, line 5 * * claim 1 * * figure 13 *; | [A]DE4326262 (GEIGER PETER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE9216024U (KÜMA WERKZEUGMASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 5, line 10 - line 27 * * page 7, line 10 - line 31 * * figure 2 * |