EP1237129 - Service providing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eguchi, Toshihiro, c/oHitachi Ltd., Inte.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.,5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Michio, c/oHitachi Ltd., Intell.Propert.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.,5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Miyatake, Manabu, c/oHitachi Ltd., Int.Prop.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.,5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Nagano, Hirofumi, c/oHitachi Ltd., Inte.Prope.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.,5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Sasaki, Toshiro, c/oHitachi Ltd., Intel.Prope.Group New Marunouchi Bldg.,5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2002/36] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2002/36] | Application number, filing date | 01127144.2 | 15.11.2001 | [2002/36] | Priority number, date | JP20010057624 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001057624 | [2002/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1237129 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1237129 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/08, G07F17/42, G07B15/00 | [2002/36] | CPC: |
G06Q20/363 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP,US);
G07B15/02 (EP,US);
G07F7/0866 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, GR [2003/21] |
Former [2002/36] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bereitstellung von Dienstleistungen | [2002/36] | English: | Service providing method | [2002/36] | French: | Méthode pour la fourniture de services | [2002/36] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 17.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/47] | 31.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 10.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2793101 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 27 - page 8, line 36 *; | [Y]WO0062260 (SWISSCOM AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 21 * * page 6, line 22 - page 9, line 23 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 22 *; | [Y]EP1069539 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-14 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 3, line 8 - line 43 * * column 5, line 22 - column 8, line 57 * * column 10, line 33 - column 14, line 40 *; | [A]US6192349 (HUSEMANN DIRK [CH], et al) [A] 1,5,10,12 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 37 - line 62 * * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 21 *; | [A]US5923884 (PEYRET PATRICE [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10,12 * column A; figure -; claim - * * column 1, line 8 - line 32 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 16 * * column 7, line 20 - column 9, line 40 *; | [A]US5483234 (CARREEL ERIC [FR], et al) [A] 1,5,10,12 * column A; figure - * * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 34 *; | [A]EP0623903 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [A]US6085976 (SEHR RICHARD P [US]) |