Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1376935
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
13.08.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
20.02.2004 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] |
14.11.2003 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
14.11.2003 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.2004 [2004/01] |
08.04.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.01.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
21.10.2002 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|