EP1376935 - RADIO LAN SYSTEM AND RADIO LAN SYSTEM CONTROLLING METHOD AND CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request | 13.08.2004 | New entry: Request for decision: result | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yozan Inc. 3-5-18, Kitazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155-0031 / JP | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKATORI, Sunao, c/o YOZAN INC. 3-5-18, Kitazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155-0031 / JP | 02 /
KIYOMATSU, Hisanori, c/o YOZAN INC. 3-5-18, Kitazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo 155-0031 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | James, Michael John Gwynne, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22, Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 01274096.5 | 30.03.2001 | [2004/01] | WO2001JP02748 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02082734 | Date: | 17.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1376935 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04W84/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/12 (EP,US);
H04L45/00 (US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04M1/72505 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | FUNK-LAN-SYSTEM UND FUNK-LAN-SYSTEMSTEUERVERFAHREN UND -STEUERPROGRAMM | [2004/01] | English: | RADIO LAN SYSTEM AND RADIO LAN SYSTEM CONTROLLING METHOD AND CONTROL PROGRAM | [2004/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE RESEAU LOCAL RADIO ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE SYSTEME DE RESEAU LOCAL RADIO ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2002 | Translation filed | 01.10.2002 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2002 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2002 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 06.02.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/15] | 06.03.2004 | Request for decision received: Claims | 18.08.2004 | Result of request for decision (Claims): Request rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07131842 (IBM); | [A]JP2000174899 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |